Ahmad, Dildar (CPSO#: 24012)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 11 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Apr 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 11-Apr-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1970
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 11 Apr 2018