Ahmad, Fuad (CPSO#: 96577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medplex Walk in Clinic / House Call
25 Woodstream Blvd , Unit 6
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7Y8
Phone: 905-265-0717
Fax: 905-266-1056
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Durham Doctors House Call Service
35 Webbford st
Ajax ON  L1S 0A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 619-6641
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ahmad ( CPSO# 96577 )

Business Address:
104 James Govan Drive
Whitby ON  L1N 0J7
Phone Number: (905) 619-6641

Business Address:
Unit 6
25 Woodstream Boulevard
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7Y8
Phone Number: (905) 265-0717

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FUAD AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2012