Ahmad, Ishtiaq (CPSO#: 92165)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 08 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 09 Dec 2009 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010