Ahmad, Jamil (CPSO#: 92860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone: (905) 278-7077
Fax: (905) 275-1582
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad-Toesti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ahmad ( CPSO# 92860 )
Dr. A. Toesti ( CPSO# 96905 )

Business Address:
The Plastic Surgery Clinic Inc.
1421 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Phone Number: (905) 278-7077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010