Ahmed, Amna Nabi (CPSO#: 95306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room A3-7
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43790
Fax: 905-575-2645
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amna N. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmed ( CPSO# 95306 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
A3 - 16 711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA NABI AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2016