Ahmed, Bedri Usmael (CPSO#: 90513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Ethiopian

Education:Jimma University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centre
for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone: (416) 640-7391
Fax: (416) 261-1896
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TAIBU Community Health Centre
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 644-3536
Fax: (416) 644-0102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6 - 603 Church St N
Ajax ON  L1T 0B8
Canada
Phone: (289) 660-3111
Fax: (289) 660-3559
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bedri U. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ahmed ( CPSO# 90513 )

Business Address:
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 644-3536

Business Address:
Scarborough Centre for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3
Phone Number: (416) 640-7391

Business Address:
6 - 603 Church Street North
Ajax ON  L1T 0B8
Phone Number: (289) 660-3111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEDRI USMAEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012