Ahmed, Maaz Ibrahim Abdelaziz (CPSO#: 94665)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Khartoum, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2010 to 20 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013