Ahmed, Maheen (CPSO#: 87530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trainyards Family Medical Centre
Unit 22B,
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 7312244
Fax: 6132604802
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 7377600 Ext. 2441
Fax: 6137383254
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maheen Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahmed ( CPSO# 87530 )

Business Address:
Trainyards Family Medical Centre
Unit 22B
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHEEN AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010