Ahmed, Muhammad Ejaz (CPSO#: 89990)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013