Ahmed, Musawir (CPSO#: 97512)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 23 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 23 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2018