Ahmed, Najma Ayesha (CPSO#: 73094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
3-073, Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5481
Fax: (416) 864-3083
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Najma Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
3-073 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Ahmed Marshall Lawless Rizoli de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizoli ( CPSO# 64858 )
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 30263 )
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAJMA AYESHA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1998