Ahmed, Sadaf Khurshid (CPSO#: 83884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-3950
Fax: (905) 336-9632
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadaf Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 83884 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Center
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADAF KHURSHID AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 27 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 28 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2009