Ahmed, Samar Mohammed Shadly (CPSO#: 91989)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2009 to 04 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013