Ahmed, Sara Roxanne (CPSO#: 95595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Health Centre
2 Elgin Park Dr.
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Fax: (905) 852-3531
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Roxanne Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 95595 )

Business Address:
Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
Uxbridge Health Centre
Unit B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA ROXANNE AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013