Ahmed, Syed Tariq (CPSO#: 83261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kashmiri, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B9
Phone: (519) 637-8074
Fax: (519) 637-2646
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: (519) 631-1825
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 3W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: (519) 631-1825
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Tariq Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 83261 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
426 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1B9
Phone Number: (519) 637-8074

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED TARIQ AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007