Ahmed, Youmna (CPSO#: 90337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 11 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Youmna  Ahmed  may  practise  medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.