Ahn, Richard Allan (CPSO#: 80800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Second Floor, Barnicke Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ophthalmic Consultant Centres
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Canada
Phone: (905) 212-9482
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2125 Wyecroft Rd
Unit 6
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Canada
Phone: 905-842-7051
Fax: 905-842-8216
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Ahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ahn ( CPSO# 80800 )

Business Address:
6 - 2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 842-7051

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Second Floor, Barnicke Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ALLAN AHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009