Ahrens, Katlin John Paul (CPSO#: 97662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone: (519) 582-2323
Fax: (519) 582-1513
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Extendicare Hamilton
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 318-4472
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ahrens & Dr. Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahrens ( CPSO# 97662 )
Dr. D. Liu ( CPSO# 97663 )

Business Address:
Delhi Community Health Centre
105 Main Street
Delhi ON  N4B 2L8
Phone Number: (519) 582-2323

Business Address:
50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3

Business Address:
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 7W1

Business Address:
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATLIN JOHN PAUL AHRENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHRENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014