Ailon, Jonathan Isaac (CPSO#: 91029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4 146 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ailon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ailon ( CPSO# 91029 )
Dr. M. Lynch ( CPSO# 91042 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4-146 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8251

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ISAAC AILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AILON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013