Akcakir, Yasemin (CPSO#: 95967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2050 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X4
Phone: (416) 763-1171
Fax: (416) 763-0573
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1575 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M9N 2R3
Canada
Phone: (416) 243-2273
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5721
Fax: 4166032782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasemin Akcakir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Akcakir ( CPSO# 95967 )

Business Address:
2050 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X4
Phone Number: (416) 763-1171

Business Address:
8E472
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5721

Business Address:
1575 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M9N 2R3
Phone Number: (416) 243-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASEMIN AKCAKIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKCAKIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2014