Akhtar, Nadeem (CPSO#: 92377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of London, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Department of Psychiatry &
Behavioural Neurosciences
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Administration B3, 100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 6674847
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nadeem Akhtar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry  and  Behavioural Neurosciences, McMaster University, in
                        which Dr. Akhtar holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
                  2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires seven years
                        from the date of issuance  or  when Dr. Akhtar  no longer holds the
                        academic appointment in accordance  with  clause 1, whichever comes
                        first.
                  
            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Akhtar's clinical
                        performance,  knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does  not  receive  an  annual  report  or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Akhtar's  certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on March 26, 2014, and expires on June  30,
                  2020.  Upon renewal of Dr.  Akhtar's  academic  appointment  at  McMaster
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.