Akhtar, Shazia (CPSO#: 91339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rymal Gage Medical Center
905 rymal road east
Hamilton ON  L8W 3M2
Phone: (905) 389 4109
Fax: (905) 389 7279
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Akhtar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 91339 )

Business Address:
Rymal Gage Medical Center
905 Rymal Road East
Hamilton ON  L8W 3M2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4109

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAZIA AKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012