Akincioglu, Cigdem (CPSO#: 84000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 09 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:Gazi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Deptartment of Nuclear Medicine
Room C3 209
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3528
Fax: (519) 663-3860
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akincioglu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Akincioglu ( CPSO# 84000 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Nuclear Medicine
C3 209
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3528


Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Turkey

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIGDEM AKINCIOGLU may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. AKINCIOGLU holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. AKINCIOGLU may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2011