Akindele, Olufunmi Olubunmi (CPSO#: 81533)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 06 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015