Akingbola, Olurotimi Akintayo (CPSO#: 73290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Medical Centre
220 Dundas Street West
UNIT 305
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 668-5560
Fax: (905) 668-5561
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court Road
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O.A. Akingbola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akingbola ( CPSO# 73290 )

Business Address:
Dundas Medical Centre
Unit 306
220 Dunas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 668-5560

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUROTIMI AKINTAYO AKINGBOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINGBOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Mar 1999 to 28 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000