Akladios, Hala Nazmy (CPSO#: 92254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3392
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2-726 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905-575-0777
Fax: 905-575-9800
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hala N. Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Akladios ( CPSO# 103397)
Dr. H. Akladios ( CPSO# 92254 )

Business Address:
2 - 726 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 4K1

Business Address:
Medical One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3392

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA NAZMY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 14 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 15 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012