Akula, Hari Priya (CPSO#: 86910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Gulbarga University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Valley Medical Clinic
21 Main Street North
Grand Valley ON  L9W 5S6
Phone: (519) 928-5666
Fax: (519) 928-3260
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

140 ROLLING HILLS DR.
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-7575
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Akula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akula ( CPSO# 86910 )

Business Address:
Grand Valley Medical Clinic
21 Main Street North
Grand Valley ON  L9W 5S6
Phone Number: (519) 928-5666

Business Address:
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Business Address:
Suite L-1
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARI PRIYA AKULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010