Al Asheeri, Nabeel Ahmed Yusuf Ahmed (CPSO#: 80657)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007