Al Azzoni, Ashraf Mamoun Rashid (CPSO#: 90478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Heart Health Institute
235 Salem Rd 2nd Floor
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Heart Health Institute
412-1371 Nielson Rd
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Al Azzoni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al Azzoni ( CPSO# 90478 )

Business Address:
Heart Health Institute
2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1

Business Address:
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHRAF MAMOUN RASHID AL AZZONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL AZZONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013