Al Bahrani, Ahmed Taher M (CPSO#: 90196)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 26 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Feb 2009 to 20 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010