Al Faris, Jamila Ali Hassan (CPSO#: 89758)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 19 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2008 to 23 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2012