Al Farsi, Abdulaziz Mohammed Majid (CPSO#: 92676)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2010 to 28 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018