Al Ghamdi, Abdulaziz Abdulrahman Safer (CPSO#: 82064)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2004 to 12 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007