Al Ghazaly, Samer Ahmed Farghaly (CPSO#: 90286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52201
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samer Al Ghazaly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al Ghazaly ( CPSO# 90286 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMER AHMED FARGHALY AL GHAZALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL GHAZALY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016