Al Hajery, Ahmad Hamoud Ishaq (CPSO#: 73261)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2001