Al Hammadi, Ahmed Hassan Ali Ahmed (CPSO#: 89940)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2010