Al Hammadi, Entesar Abdulla Sultan Ali (CPSO#: 89587)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010