Al Harbi, Waseem Marzouq Olyan (CPSO#: 73059)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000