Al Hilal, Adnan Jasem (CPSO#: 81908)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006