Al Hinai, Aisha Mohammed Abdullah (CPSO#: 78939)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 16 Apr 2003 to 02 Jul 2003
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 03 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004