Al Hindi, Taghreed Talal Mahmood (CPSO#: 92653)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Apr 2010 to 12 Jul 2010
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2010 to 12 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017