Al Ismaili, Mohammed Humoud Said (CPSO#: 78249)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2013