Al Jardani, Amina Khalfan Said (CPSO#: 81760)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 31 Jul 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006