Al Jawad, Hameed Hassan Hameed (CPSO#: 79926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dahran Street
Almoosa Specialist Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Lab Medicine
Al-Ahsa 5098
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966555018446

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMEED HASSAN HAMEED AL JAWAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL JAWAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007