Al Kandari, Salem Ali A (CPSO#: 82323)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2005 to 17 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 18 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2011