Al Mansoori, Taleb Mohamed Ebrahim M S Al Mansoor (CPSO#: 85862)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2007 to 26 Mar 2007
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2007 to 13 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
PEAP - Resident - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017