Al Marzooq, Reem Marzooq Ali (CPSO#: 89651)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010