Al Marzouqi, Aamna Ahmed Abdulla Al Mulla (CPSO#: 75930)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002