Al Marzouqi, Omar Mohamed Rafea Ibrahim Mohamed Amin (CPSO#: 93717)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2010 to 23 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016