Al Masri, Nasser Mohammed M (CPSO#: 85477)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008